Financial history IN KIND DIRECT

Charity number: 1052679
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £18.88m £16.88m £17.91m £29.95m £32.13m
Total expenditure £18.69m £17.29m £18.31m £29.17m £32.17m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £2.96k
Income - Donations and legacies £1.21m £478.61k £485.31k £862.54k £354.98k
Income - Other trading activities £150.25k £182.16k £128.80k £113.10k £242.53k
Income - Charitable activities £17.52m £16.17m £17.25m £28.90m £31.47m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £913 £387 £2.23k £212 £0
Income - Other £0 £50.42k £40.80k £72.85k £65.48k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £18.53m £17.12m £18.16m £29.02m £31.99m
Expenditure - Raising funds £158.88k £167.14k £149.79k £147.49k £188.41k
Expenditure - Governance £11.05k £11.38k £84.41k £85.12k £74.12k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0