Trustees IN KIND DIRECT

Charity number: 1052679
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
TERESA TIDEMAN Chair
None on record
Ayshea Farooq Trustee 29 June 2022
SUPPORTING FAMILIES CHARITY
Received: On time
Alec Grant Trustee 29 June 2022
None on record
Chirag Patel Trustee 29 June 2022
None on record
Richard Jonathan Wolff Trustee 09 May 2019
IKDI
Received: On time
Martin David Newman Trustee 09 May 2019
None on record
Barry Furlong Trustee 09 May 2019
None on record
Scott William Barton Trustee 01 June 2018
None on record
Tim Hinton Trustee 29 June 2017
None on record
Graham David Inglis Trustee 01 May 2017
IKDI
Received: On time
Graham Paul Burridge Trustee 01 May 2017
None on record
Tom Moody Trustee 18 May 2015
None on record
Debra Marjorie Allcock Tyler Trustee 24 June 2014
None on record
AJAY KAVAN Trustee 28 August 2012
None on record