Financial history DARITE VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 1052937
Charity reporting is overdue by 249 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2016 31/05/2017 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020
Total gross income £20.72k £13.54k £6.95k £6.82k £15.46k
Total expenditure £25.34k £4.67k £2.58k £8.70k £4.08k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £10.00k