THE HALL FOR CORNWALL TRUST

Charity number: 1053028
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Alan Davey CBE Trustee 30 July 2018
ENGLISH FOLK DANCE AND SONG SOCIETY Received: 5 days late
TRINITY LABAN CONSERVATOIRE OF MUSIC AND DANCE Received: On time
James Alan Bennett Trustee 30 July 2018 None on record
Christopher Charles Pomfret OBE Chair 31 May 2016 None on record
Dame ROSEMARY ANNE SQUIRE DBE Trustee
THEATRE DEVELOPMENT TRUST Received: On time
Richard Williams Trustee 23 January 2018
EMMAUS CORNWALL Received: On time
DONNA MUNDAY Trustee 23 February 2021 None on record
Holly Hipkins Trustee 23 February 2021 None on record
Sarah Louise Newton Trustee 25 November 2019 None on record
Vinesh Govender Trustee 30 July 2018 None on record
DAVID JOHN POLLARD Trustee 23 January 2018
HARVEY'S FOUNDRY TRUST Received: On time
CORNWALL INTERNATIONAL MALE CHORAL FESTIVAL LTD Received: On time
KATHRYN ELIZABETH LUDLOW Trustee 04 September 2017
INTERNATIONAL RESCUE COMMITTEE, U.K Received: On time