Accounts and annual returns ST JOHN FISHER R.C. PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1053087
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 08 April 2021 25 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 08 April 2021 25 January 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 08 April 2020 08 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 08 April 2020 08 February 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 08 April 2019 21 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 08 April 2019 21 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 08 April 2018 25 February 2019 17 days late
Accounts and TAR 08 April 2018 25 February 2019 17 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 08 April 2017 07 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 08 April 2017 07 January 2018 On time Download Open in new window