Financial history ST JOHN FISHER R.C. PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1053087
Charity reporting is up to date (67 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 08/04/2018 08/04/2019 08/04/2020 08/04/2021 08/04/2022
Total gross income £111.22k £149.60k £125.63k £115.50k £121.30k
Total expenditure £102.85k £131.14k £126.12k £118.73k £118.94k
Income from government contracts £79.77k £103.70k £99.89k £93.16k £93.11k
Income from government grants N/A £17.69k £490 N/A N/A