CANA TRUST

Charity number: 1053570
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/04/2016 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020
Total gross income £42.29k £42.38k £42.13k £36.83k £57.13k
Total expenditure £33.55k £42.74k £48.24k £36.80k £38.59k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A