CANA TRUST

Charity number: 1053570
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2020 02 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 02 February 2021 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2019 09 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 09 July 2019 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2018 15 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 15 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2017 21 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 21 November 2017 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2016 05 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2016 05 October 2016 On time Download