ST THOMAS MORE PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION (DERBYSHIRE)

Charity number: 1053754
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £8.80k £8.70k £7.99k £6.42k £13.41k
Total expenditure £7.73k £9.88k £9.10k £4.42k £10.52k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A