Trustees GARRETT'S CHARITY

Charity number: 1053847
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
CLIVE RONALD OXBY Chair
AGE UK LINCOLN AND SOUTH LINCOLNSHIRE
Received: On time
Pike and Eure and George Walker Educational Foundation
Received: On time
Rev Lorna Daphne Brabin-Smith Trustee 09 May 2022
None on record
Nicholas James Eyre Trustee 24 February 2021
None on record
Georgina Jane Chard Trustee 02 December 2020
LINCOLNSHIRE RURAL SUPPORT NETWORK
Received: On time
Michelle Hunter Trustee 02 December 2020
None on record
Neil Andrew Hunter Trustee 01 August 2019
None on record
Mick Bowbanks Trustee 11 July 2015
None on record
Caroline Jane Dunning Trustee 24 October 2013
Pike and Eure and George Walker Educational Foundation
Received: On time
Dennis Eric Chantler Trustee 24 October 2013
None on record