Financial history ST VINCENT DE PAUL SOCIETY (ENGLAND AND WALES)

Charity number: 1053992
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £8.87m £9.30m £9.80m £13.99m £11.15m
Total expenditure £9.26m £9.93m £10.19m £11.00m £10.29m
Income from government contracts £1 N/A £805.15k £1.80m £1.79m
Income from government grants £1 £1.46m £344.31k N/A £2.03m
Income - Donations and legacies £3.34m £3.90m £3.85m £7.63m £6.79m
Income - Other trading activities £66.41k £79.84k £77.06k £92.26k £33.18k
Income - Charitable activities £5.23m £5.06m £5.56m £5.91m £3.90m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £233.20k £260.15k £295.37k £151.07k £72.32k
Income - Other £2.48k £9.41k £13.58k £200.00k £350.43k
Income - Legacies £423.55k £664.43k £649.75k £4.01m £1.09m
Expenditure - Charitable activities £9.02m £9.68m £9.95m £10.62m £9.98m
Expenditure - Raising funds £241.61k £240.61k £245.71k £375.38k £312.24k
Expenditure - Governance £176.84k £171.38k £247.61k £0 £381.27k
Expenditure - Grants institution £829.15k £0 £0 £0 £765.91k
Expenditure - Investment management £7.67k £8.51k £6.84k £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0