Trustees ST VINCENT DE PAUL SOCIETY (ENGLAND AND WALES)

Charity number: 1053992
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Helen O'Shea Chair 01 January 2014
DEPAUL INTERNATIONAL
Received: On time
THE PORTA PIA 2012 FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE T B HUNT OR ST THOMAS AND ST BERNARD TRUST FUND
Received: On time
Dermot John McGilloway Trustee 20 July 2020
THE T B HUNT OR ST THOMAS AND ST BERNARD TRUST FUND
Received: On time
Susan Frances Roberts Trustee 20 July 2020
THE T B HUNT OR ST THOMAS AND ST BERNARD TRUST FUND
Received: On time
Mark Vernon Thompson Trustee 20 July 2020
None on record
Sebastian Muir Trustee 25 November 2017
THE T B HUNT OR ST THOMAS AND ST BERNARD TRUST FUND
Received: On time
Vincent McCallister Trustee 25 November 2017
THE T B HUNT OR ST THOMAS AND ST BERNARD TRUST FUND
Received: On time
Christine Knight Trustee 25 November 2017
THE T B HUNT OR ST THOMAS AND ST BERNARD TRUST FUND
Received: On time
Ian Kempsell Trustee 25 November 2017
THE T B HUNT OR ST THOMAS AND ST BERNARD TRUST FUND
Received: On time
JAMES BELLAMY Trustee 24 November 2017
BELLINGE COMMUNITY HOUSE
Received: On time
THE T B HUNT OR ST THOMAS AND ST BERNARD TRUST FUND
Received: On time
Elaine Heyworth Trustee 17 March 2017
THE T B HUNT OR ST THOMAS AND ST BERNARD TRUST FUND
Received: On time
Michael Willcock Trustee 01 June 2015
THE T B HUNT OR ST THOMAS AND ST BERNARD TRUST FUND
Received: On time
RICHARD PALMI Trustee 01 January 2014
THE T B HUNT OR ST THOMAS AND ST BERNARD TRUST FUND
Received: On time