Financial history THE FIRST STEP LTD

Charity number: 1054533
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £599.21k £638.68k £624.18k £606.94k £712.75k
Total expenditure £625.56k £617.47k £615.97k £600.66k £700.54k
Income from government contracts £169.74k £169.74k £169.74k £169.77k £169.74k
Income from government grants £130.00k £95.00k £95.00k £291.65k £213.58k
Income - Donations and legacies £20.57k £5.62k £3.26k £2.91k £4.67k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £578.59k £633.06k £620.92k £604.00k £708.08k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £48 £4 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £625.56k £617.47k £615.97k £600.66k £700.54k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £2.28k £1.84k £2.40k £2.40k £2.40k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0