FRIENDS OF METTUPALAYAM

Charity number: 1054673
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £45.84k £41.42k £35.27k £26.26k £33.49k
Total expenditure £40.82k £47.93k £42.82k £27.88k £45.72k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A