Financial history BULGARIAN SUPPORT FUND

Charity number: 1054734
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2017 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 30/04/2020 30/04/2021
Total gross income £24.40k £29.82k £24.92k £29.66k £24.52k
Total expenditure £32.45k £40.07k £16.68k £19.60k £11.04k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A