Financial history BURNLEY YOUTH THEATRE

Charity number: 1054763
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £305.02k £285.85k £345.97k £341.80k £382.12k
Total expenditure £331.48k £323.55k £366.75k £344.86k £375.73k
Income from government contracts £0 £21.72k N/A £7.08k £12.57k
Income from government grants £3.00k £102.46k £71.28k £66.36k £86.57k