ATTLEBOROUGH DAY CENTRE

Charity number: 1054909
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2020 20 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 20 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2019 23 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 23 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2018 14 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 14 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2017 24 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 24 January 2018 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2016 27 March 2017 50 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2016 27 March 2017 50 days late Download