ENFIELD BANGLADESH WELFARE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1055430
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £48.45k £71.45k £72.20k £54.79k £27.77k
Total expenditure £85.40k £75.91k £62.61k £58.45k £46.62k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £31.15k £34.71k £35.45k £25.06k N/A