ENFIELD BANGLADESH WELFARE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1055430
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

19 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
RUHUL AMIN Trustee 23 November 2013 None on record
MINHAZ KHAN Trustee 22 October 2016 None on record
ALAMGIR KAZI Trustee None on record
MIZANUR RAHMAN Trustee None on record
MOHAMMED KAMRUZZAMAN Trustee None on record
Kajal Sarker Trustee 10 November 2019 None on record
SUMONA CHOWDHURY Trustee 14 December 2012 None on record
A WADOOD MASOOD Trustee None on record
Rafiqul Alam Trustee 02 November 2019 None on record
MD ABU MAZHAR Trustee None on record
MR Chaudhury Anwar Chair 30 January 2016 None on record
SALMA S CHOWDHURY Trustee 16 December 2013 None on record
MORSHEDA BEGUM Trustee None on record
ASHRAF ZAMAN Trustee 16 December 2013
DU ALUMNI ASSOCIATION UK Recently registered
REHANAZ NOOR Trustee None on record
Anwar Kabir Khan Trustee 10 November 2019 None on record
Fardoush Ahmed Chowdhury Trustee 29 April 2018 None on record
EKRAMUZZAMAN KHAN Trustee 16 December 2013 None on record
MAHMUDUL HASAN Trustee None on record