Financial history THE FRIENDS OF BURSTON CHURCH

Charity number: 1055487
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £3.40k £839 £2.59k £2.30k £0
Total expenditure £5.77k £1.48k £1.78k £2.53k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A