KALA SANGAM

Charity number: 1055488
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £581.35k £772.90k £416.69k £422.32k £414.28k
Total expenditure £453.39k £509.33k £581.70k £554.41k £510.10k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £20.00k £30.22k £20.00k £24.43k £20.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £18.57k £8.99k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 £317.25k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £371.52k £444.35k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment £4.48k £2.31k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other £186.78k £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £444.96k £499.05k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £8.43k £10.28k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £21.47k £8.24k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A