KALA SANGAM

Charity number: 1055488
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
James Wilson Trustee 30 January 2020 None on record
Jasbir Singh Athwal Chair 18 April 2019
LEEDS CARES Received: On time
Caroline Harrison Trustee 21 July 2016
WAKEFIELD GRAMMAR SCHOOL FOUNDATION Received: On time
WILSON'S GIFT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE VICAR OF WAKEFIELD Received: On time
THE BROTHERTON SCIENCE SCHOLARSHIP Received: On time
BISHOP ASHTON ESSAY PRIZE ICW WAKEFIELD GRAMMAR SCHOOL Received: On time
Amrit Kaur Gata-Aura Trustee 28 May 2020 None on record
Jenny Jowle Trustee 18 July 2019
PLAY BRADFORD Received: On time
PAUL STANLEY NASH Trustee 16 March 2017 None on record
MARIE O'REILLY Trustee 31 October 2012 None on record
Rashmi Sudhir Trustee 18 April 2019 None on record