Accounts and annual returns THE GABRIEL FUND

Charity number: 1055716
Charity reporting is overdue by 142 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 142 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 142 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 30 January 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 23 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 16 March 2021 44 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 16 March 2021 44 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 19 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 19 December 2019 On time Download Open in new window