Financial history THE GABRIEL FUND

Charity number: 1055716
Charity reporting is overdue by 143 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £193.31k £191.92k £119.25k £80 £12
Total expenditure £87.67k £96.66k £182.09k £555.10k £20.99k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A