Trustees THE DAFFODIL SOCIETY

Charity number: 1055817
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

17 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
IAN CHARLES TYLER Chair 07 March 2021
None on record
PETER FREDERICK WILKINS Trustee 07 March 2021
None on record
ERIC PICKARD Trustee 06 March 2016
None on record
KENNETH HARROP Trustee 05 March 2015
None on record
JEFFREY ENGLISH Trustee 05 March 2015
None on record
ROBIN CROUCHMAN Trustee 05 March 2015
None on record
DALE GRIFFIN Trustee 05 March 2014
None on record
GILLIAN GRIFFIN Trustee 05 March 2013
None on record
CAMILLA BASSETT-SMITH Trustee 05 March 2012
None on record
LEONARD PERCY OLIVE Trustee
None on record
MICHAEL WILLIAM BAXTER Trustee
None on record
REGINALD NICHOLL Trustee
None on record
DEREK JOHN PHILLIPS Trustee
None on record
THERESA ROSEMARY BRAITHWAITE Trustee
None on record
MICHAEL HENSON Trustee
None on record
KEITH BOXALL Trustee
None on record
JACQUELINE MARGARET PETHERBRIDGE Trustee
None on record