Financial history ST AUGUSTINE OF CANTERBURY PTFA

Charity number: 1055884
Charity reporting is overdue by 89 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £13.98k £17.75k £9.14k £13.99k £7.21k
Total expenditure £7.26k £10.84k £8.19k £19.11k £11.81k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A