Financial history CYLCH MEITHRIN BETHEL

Charity number: 1056176
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £23.89k £49.76k £66.95k £53.82k £64.58k
Total expenditure £21.47k £31.04k £40.54k £44.14k £47.00k
Income from government contracts £1.52k N/A £45.73k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £5.96k £7.87k N/A £12.39k £3.91k