HUMPTY DUMPTY'S EASTON PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1056309
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £118.25k £108.87k £127.04k £92.54k £24.24k
Total expenditure £127.71k £108.59k £108.84k £114.85k £49.10k
Income from government contracts £0 £85.80k £85.73k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £4.51k N/A N/A