Financial history SWFT CHARITY

Charity number: 1056424
Charity reporting is up to date (1 day late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/04/2017 01/04/2018 01/04/2019 01/04/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £1.04m £740.00k £1.11m £583.00k £939.00k
Total expenditure £642.00k £1.19m £1.65m £585.00k £403.00k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.01m £727.00k £1.11m £565.00k £927.00k
Income - Other trading activities £24.00k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £9.00k £2.00k £17.00k £12.00k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £3.00k £4.00k £0 £1.00k £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £445.00k £92.00k £123.00k £175.00k £413.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £593.00k £1.15m £1.60m £498.00k £311.00k
Expenditure - Raising funds £49.00k £43.00k £55.00k £87.00k £92.00k
Expenditure - Governance £30.00k £28.00k £4.20k £35.00k £4.20k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0