Accounts and annual returns SWFT CHARITY

Charity number: 1056424
Charity reporting is up to date (1 day late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 01 February 2022 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 01 February 2022 1 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 April 2020 01 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2020 01 February 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 April 2019 30 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2019 30 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 April 2018 29 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2018 29 January 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 April 2017 22 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2017 22 January 2018 On time Download Open in new window