Financial history WOOTTON BASSETT INFANTS SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1056601
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022
Total gross income £12.60k £10.67k £11.54k £2.77k £10.42k
Total expenditure £10.01k £6.17k £15.42k £4.82k £9.51k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A