Financial history KING ALFRED'S SCHOOL FUND

Charity number: 1057062
Charity reporting is overdue by 75 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022
Total gross income £10.90k £19.77k £12.41k £11.80k £15.25k
Total expenditure £6.25k £20.65k £11.22k £7.13k £12.50k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A