LONDON CONCERT CHOIR

Charity number: 1057242
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £197.07k £121.69k £122.20k £159.17k £62.81k
Total expenditure £184.80k £139.52k £115.34k £171.62k £57.96k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A