LONDON CONCERT CHOIR

Charity number: 1057242
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JENNIFER MARY GREENWAY Trustee 18 January 2010 None on record
ELEANOR LOUISE COWIE Trustee 11 November 2002 None on record
MARTIN DAVID GOODWIN Trustee 21 January 2019 None on record
JAMES ALISDAIR FINLAY Chair 21 January 2019 None on record
Chris Finch Trustee 12 March 2018
INDEPENDENT CANCER PATIENTS' VOICE Received: On time
STEPHEN CHRISTOPHER RICKETT Trustee 06 November 2000 None on record