Financial history FORWARD IN FAITH

Charity number: 1057246
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £336.84k £407.62k £458.15k £311.95k £224.03k
Total expenditure £357.23k £334.69k £309.39k £279.12k £273.69k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A