Trustees FORWARD IN FAITH

Charity number: 1057246
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
THE RT REVD Anthony William Robinson SSC Chair 15 November 2014
ADDITIONAL CURATES SOCIETY
Received: On time
LEEDS DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time
CROSS PROJECT
Received: On time
BETHANY HOUSE HEALING CENTRE
Received: On time
YORKSHIRE THEOLOGICAL EDUCATION PARTNERSHIP
Received: On time
Rt Rev Jonathan Mark Richard Baker SSC Trustee 11 March 2020
THE SOCIETY OF ST STEPHEN'S HOUSE
Received: On time
THE LONDON DIOCESAN FUND
Received: On time
PARISH ESTATES CHARITY
Received: On time
BROMFIELD'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
ASCOT PRIORY
Received: On time
THE MASONS COMPANY CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
ST ANDREW HOLBORN AND STAFFORD'S CHARITY
Received: On time
ST ANDREW HOLBORN CHURCH FOUNDATION
Received: On time
STAFFORD'S CHARITY
Received: On time
LADY ELIZABETH HATTON'S CHARITY
Received: On time
Rev Philip Peter Corbett Trustee 06 March 2019
SOCIETY FOR THE MAINTENANCE OF THE FAITH
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ALL SAINTS WITH ST COLUMB'S, NOTTING HILL
Received: On time
THE ECUMENICAL MARIAN PILGRIMAGE TRUST
Received: On time
T A Y FUND
Received: On time
Rev EDWARD JAMES RUSSELL MARTIN MA Trustee 03 October 2017
WILLIAM QUARLES
Received: On time
EDMUND MOULTON
Received: On time
HANNAH RUTH PHILLIPS Trustee 03 October 2017
None on record
Rev IAN DOUGLAS MCCORMACK Trustee 03 October 2017
None on record
Dr RICHARD JOHN MANTLE OBE DL Trustee 28 September 2015
FRIENDS OF OPERA NORTH
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST WILFRID'S HARROGATE
Received: On time
THE PATRICIA HAREWOOD TRUST
Received: 159 days late
OPERA NORTH LIMITED
Received: On time
Rev Paul John Benfield Trustee 28 September 2015
None on record
JONATHAN MARTIN ROBIN PRICHARD Trustee 06 January 2014
CHICHESTER THEOLOGICAL TRUST
Received: On time
THE SUSSEX HISTORIC CHURCHES TRUST
Received: On time
HYDE CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE COMMUNITY TRUST OF THE BLESSED VIRGIN MARY
Received: 1 day late
Dr LINDSAY KATHLEEN NEWCOMBE Trustee 28 September 2011
None on record