ROWDE ACADEMY FRIENDS AND TEACHERS

Charity number: 1057397
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 01/10/2016 01/10/2017 01/10/2018 01/10/2019 01/10/2020
Total gross income £2.85k £7.49k £6.87k £5.57k £1.85k
Total expenditure £3.39k £1.34k £3.71k £7.06k £4.48k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A