THE JOHN MORDAUNT TRUST

Charity number: 1057491
Charity reporting is overdue by 360 days
Registration history:
  • 12 August 1996: Standard registration
  • 16 September 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
  • 20 January 2010: Standard registration
  • 09 September 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
  • 28 September 2011: Re-registered
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • JOHN MORDAUNT TRUST (Working name)
  • JOHN'S TRUST (Working name)
  • JOHNS' TRUST (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property