Financial history REDBRIDGE CARERS SUPPORT SERVICE

Charity number: 1057505
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £446.32k £488.60k £577.76k £495.15k £549.88k
Total expenditure £385.63k £518.95k £538.49k £515.80k £515.73k
Income from government contracts £239.88k £229.68k £240.68k £240.68k £229.68k
Income from government grants £0 £11.00k £240.68k £240.68k £7.00k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £6.70k N/A £2.19k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £568.45k N/A £544.18k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A £2.61k N/A £3.51k
Income - Other N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £538.49k N/A £515.73k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 N/A £0