ANDREW CASSELL FOUNDATION (RACING FOR THE DISABLED)

Charity number: 1057742
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 22 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 02 July 2019 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 23 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 06 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2015 18 January 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2015 Not Required
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)