FRIENDS OF DUNBURY ACADEMY (FODA)

Charity number: 1057974
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £4.78k £5.72k £6.27k £8.21k £5.44k