Accounts and annual returns LEEDS THEATRE IN EDUCATION COMPANY

Charity number: 1058001
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 26 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 09 November 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 26 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 27 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 05 February 2020 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 30 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 22 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 24 October 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 29 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 22 November 2017 On time Download Open in new window