Financial history LEEDS THEATRE IN EDUCATION COMPANY

Charity number: 1058001
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £40.79k £36.21k £9.65k £32.13k £5.48k
Total expenditure £24.97k £42.75k £11.51k £20.97k £9.78k
Income from government contracts £11.12k £21.40k N/A £2.75k N/A
Income from government grants £0 £1.48k N/A £13.46k N/A