Financial history FRIENDS OF SAINT THERESA'S

Charity number: 1058253
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021
Total gross income £9.46k £13.46k £6.65k £4.04k £697
Total expenditure £6.42k £17.33k £117 £3.77k £123
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A