THE CALMCOTT TRUST

Charity number: 1058522
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/04/2016 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020
Total gross income £23.99k £22.70k £29.32k £30.20k £29.24k
Total expenditure £37.61k £32.79k £31.75k £38.21k £36.74k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A