BRISTOL LAW CENTRE

Charity number: 1059022
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Income from government contracts £309.67k £0 £270.30k N/A £217.67k
Income from government grants £0 £548.82k N/A £220.26k £217.70k
Other income £394.20k £346.97k £943.00k £760.66k £578.94k
Total expenditure £806.16k £892.18k £811.56k £941.27k £995.85k