BRISTOL LAW CENTRE

Charity number: 1059022
Charity reporting is up to date

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Ruth Richardson Trustee 12 May 2020 None on record
Michael Timothy Silvey Trustee 14 March 2017 None on record
Jonathan Locke Lovibond Trustee 02 February 2021 None on record
Vita Falbo-Ellis Trustee 12 May 2020 None on record
Dr Oliver Geoffrey William Lewis Trustee 03 November 2015 None on record
Katie Pritchard Trustee 20 November 2018 None on record
Esther Pickup Keller Trustee 30 May 2019 None on record
Padma Ramanan Trustee 17 October 2016 None on record
Dipika Keen Trustee 11 August 2015 None on record
Tara Wolfe Trustee 12 May 2020 None on record
ROGER BERRY Trustee 19 November 2014 None on record