Financial history ST. OSYTH HISTORICAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 1059097
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/03/2018 01/03/2019 01/03/2020 01/03/2021 01/03/2022
Total gross income £1.29k £1.66k £1.84k £9.94k £19.21k
Total expenditure £1.87k £1.92k £1.68k £6.46k £9.04k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £17.91k