Financial history HIGHFIELD PARK TRUST

Charity number: 1059251
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £205.31k £240.25k £249.33k £230.04k £279.68k
Total expenditure £272.76k £197.94k £311.80k £280.14k £218.22k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £9.52k £15.37k £5.33k £24.01k £4.00k