Trustees HIGHFIELD PARK TRUST

Charity number: 1059251
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
TIM ABBOTT Chair
None on record
Louise Neicho Trustee 06 December 2022
None on record
Ben Weeks Trustee 06 December 2022
None on record
Vignas Gunasegaran Trustee 19 April 2021
None on record
Nicola Ward Trustee 19 April 2021
None on record
Etheldreda Mary Gordon Trustee 10 June 2019
None on record
Ian Jamieson Day Trustee 09 June 2015
CHARLES MORRIS HALL
Received: On time
MIKE CURTIS Trustee 19 October 2011
None on record
SARAH GRAHAM Trustee 17 October 2011
None on record
KEVIN BARNES Trustee 14 October 2011
None on record
SUSAN GAYLARD Trustee
None on record
Roger Thomas Trustee
None on record